Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB389
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Provides for creation of tax increment areas by municipalities to defray costs of certain undertakings. (BDR 22815)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 420.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-05-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-19-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-27-2005 02:52 PM    Minutes      Concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-26   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.377 Amend. No.909

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 377.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 909.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate.

May 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 909 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 420.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo