Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB391
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Revises provisions governing liability for tax on financial institutions. (BDR 32-716)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 422.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-07-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, and rerefer.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-04   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1074

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 16, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2005

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 27, 2005

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1074.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.

May 30, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 422.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo