Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB392
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Makes various changes to state financial administration. (BDR 32-683)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-14-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     May-16-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     Jun-04-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint     5th Reprint            
Amendments Amend. No.442 Amend. No.948 Amend. No.992 Amend. No.1024 Amend. No.1151

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 442.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 948.) To printer.

May 24, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.

May 25, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 992.) To printer.

May 26, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1024.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1151.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fifth reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Not voting: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 04, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1151 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 05, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1151 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 06, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo