Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB393
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Provides discount for electronic payment of certain taxes. (BDR 32-387)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-05-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     May-24-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
 
Bill Text As Introduced                                    
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 07, 2005

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 08, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo