Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB394
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Taxation
Makes various changes to provisions governing conveyance, subdivision and taxation of property. (BDR 32-258)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr-05-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Apr-12-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     May-10-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     May-19-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Growth and Infrastructure     May-24-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Reconsideration of previous action on: 5-19-05.   Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-31-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.379 Amend. No.1077 Amend. No.1029 Amend. No.CA15

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 379.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 1, Not voting: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1029.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1077.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 1029 and 1077 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 1029 and 1077 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 1029 and 1077 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.

Jun 16, 2005

  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 496.
  • Sections 52.1 to 52.8, inclusive, and 57 effective June 17, 2005. Sections 1 to 22, inclusive, 24 to 28, inclusive, 42 to 52, inclusive, and 53 to 56, inclusive, effective July 1, 2005. Sections 29 to 41, inclusive, effective: (a) June 17, 2005 for the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of those sections; and (b) On July 1, 2006, for all other purposes. Section 23 effective July 1, 2007. Section 43 expires by limitation June 30, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo