Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB396
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Natural Resources
Revises various provisions regarding waste disposal and regulation. (BDR 40-401)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 387.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr-11-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-16-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-18-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-20-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Natural Resources     May-31-2005 12:40 PM    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-21   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 25,   Nay 16,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 30,   Nay 11,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.272 Amend. No.1001

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 26, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1001.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 16, Excused: 1.)
  • Action of refusal of passage rescinded.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 11, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 1001 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1001 receded from. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 387.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo