Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB420
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Authorizes Drug Use Review Board to hold closed meetings for certain purposes. (BDR 19-172)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-04-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-05-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Rerefer.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr-13-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr-15-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-18-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-20-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 17,   Nay 2,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.465 Amend. No.945

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2005

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Human Resources and Education.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 465.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 2, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 945.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo