Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB530
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Makes various changes regarding ethics in government. (BDR 23-325)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar-29-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-05-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-14-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr-25-2005 11:36 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion.
  Senate Finance     Apr-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-02-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-09-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-11-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-24-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-18   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Amendments Amend. No.484 Amend. No.631 Amend. No.744

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 26, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 631.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Notice of exemption.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 16, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 744.) To printer.

May 18, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

May 19, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo