Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB453
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Judiciary
Makes various changes concerning business entities and notaries public. (BDR 7576)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 468.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-07-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Judiciary     Apr-12-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-18-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Judiciary     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-26   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.293 Amend. No.638 Amend. No.881 Amend. No.CA17

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 293.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 638.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 24, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 27, 2005

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 881 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 881 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 881 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 06, 2005

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 468.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo