Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB463
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Government Affairs
Makes various changes concerning use of revenues from disposition of unclaimed property. (BDR 30-578)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr-13-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
  Senate Finance     May-13-2005 01:00 PM    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized.
  Senate Finance     May-26-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Finance     May-27-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass, as amended.
  Senate Finance     May-30-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Finance     May-31-2005 10:30 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May-27   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.417

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 417.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 30, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo