Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AJR16
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Proposes to amend Nevada Constitution to provide requirements for enactment of property and sales tax exemptions. (BDR C-422)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 66.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar-29-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-07-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr-11-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Taxation     May-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May-11   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced                             As Enrolled        
Amendments

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2005

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 12, 2005

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 66.
  • Return to 2007 Session.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo