Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB553
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes relating to intoxicating liquors. (BDR 32-1314)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-29-2005 05:40 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     May-12-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     May-17-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr-26   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Amendments Amend. No.600 Amend. No.643 Amend. No.807

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 600.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 643.) To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 25, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 807.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 28, 2005

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo