Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB554
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Commerce and Labor
Makes various changes to provisions governing taxation. (BDR 32-1344)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar-29-2005 05:40 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR.
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr-13-2005 12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and rerefer.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-20-2005 07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-03-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Rescind previous action on: 6-02-05.   Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Finance     Jun-04-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Senate Taxation     Jun-05-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Taxation     Jun-05-2005 04:01 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Taxation     Jun-05-2005 08:10 PM    Minutes      Amend.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.558 Amend. No.1181 Amend. No.1216

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2005

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 22, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 558.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1181.) To printer.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1216.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 07, 2005

  • Senate Amendment No. 1216 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
  • Section 37 effective June 17, 2005. Section 22 of this act: (a) Effective June 17, 2005, for the purpose of adopting regulations and July 1, 2005, for all other purposes; and (b) Expires by limitation on December 21, 2005. Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, 15, 16, 20 and subsection 1 of section 36 of this act effective July 1, 2005. Sections 25 to 35, inclusive, and subsection 3 of section 36 of this act effective October 1, 2005. Sections 13 and 23 of this act effective on January 1, 2006. Sections 14, 17, 21 and 24 of this act effective January 1, 2007, only if the proposal submitted pursuant to sections 28 to 35, inclusive, of this act is approved by the voters at the General Election on November 7, 2006. Sections 18, 19 and subsection 2 of section 36 of this act effective January 1, 2007, only if the proposal submitted pursuant to sections 28 to 35, inclusive, of this act is not approved by the voters at the General Election on November 7, 2006.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo