Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB568
Introduced on: May 27, 2005
Emergency Request of Assembly Minority Leader
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hettrick
Authorizes discussions of workplace relations for certain state employees. (BDR 231476)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     May-31-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-02   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.1129

Bill History

May 27, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

May 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 01, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1129.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Jun 03, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo