Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB519
Introduced on: May 30, 2005
By: Finance
Provides for one-time issuance of check to certain persons and entities who registered one or more motor vehicles in Nevada during calendar year 2004. (BDR S1204)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Jun-02-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Amendments Amend. No.1148 Amend. No.1160

Bill History

May 30, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

May 31, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 02, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1148.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1160.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Absent: 1.)
  • Action of passage rescinded.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo