Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB523
Introduced on: Jun 05, 2005
By: Finance
Temporarily reduces rate of tax on certain businesses. (BDR 321478)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Jun-05-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Senate Finance     Jun-06-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun-06-2005 11:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Jun-05   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun-06   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.1207

Bill History

Jun 05, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1207.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.
  • Effective July 1, 2005, and expires by limitation June 30, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo