Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB36
Introduced on: Feb 04, 2005
By: Health and Human Services
Requires Director of Department of Human Resources to include in State Plan for Medicaid requirement that young adults who have “aged out” of foster care are eligible for Medicaid. (BDR 38-668)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb-23-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar-09-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass, and rerefer.
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar-29-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-09-2005 08:30 AM    Minutes      No Action.
  Assembly Ways and Means     May-23-2005 02:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-31-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Not Heard.
  Senate Finance     Jun-01-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action.
    
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Amendments Amend. No.978

Bill History

Feb 04, 2005

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 05, 2005

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2005

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2005

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 10, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 27, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 978.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To committee.

May 31, 2005

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 07, 2005

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo