Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB395
Introduced on: Mar 29, 2005
By: Natural Resources
Transfers responsibility for operation of certain programs from Health Division of Department of Human Resources to Division of Environmental Protection of State Department of Conservation and Natural Resources. (BDR 40-660)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 171.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr-11-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May-16-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass.
  Senate Finance     May-20-2005 08:00 AM    Minutes      .
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.271

Bill History

Mar 29, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 30, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 271.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 20, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2005

  • Read second time.

May 23, 2005

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 25, 2005

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2005

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 171.
  • Effective October 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo