Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

NEVADA LEGISLATURE
BILL DRAFT REQUEST LIST OF THE 74th SESSION
AS OF 07/30/07

Skip to: First | Previous | Search Requester/Subject: Terms
BDR   REQUESTER   DATE
R--1501
SCR46
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Commends Dean Richard J. Morgan in honor of his retirement as the Dean of the William S. Boyd School of Law.
On Behalf Of Senator Raggio 5/08/2007
File 87
R--1502
SCR39
Senate Committee on Human Resources and Education
SCR: Urges support of the American Stroke Association's "Power to End Stroke" campaign.
5/08/2007
File 81
15--1503
AB619
EMERGENCY REQUEST of Speaker of the Assembly
Creates a Nevada automobile theft authority.
5/08/2007
S--1504
SB570
Senate Committee on Finance
Makes appropriation for the next biennium to fund a working group to study the methamphetamine problem in Nevada.
5/09/2007
Ch. 404
R--1505
SR8
Secretary of the Senate
SR: Provides for the appointment of an additional attaché for the Senate.
5/09/2007
File 71
S--1506
AB620
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes certain changes concerning child care facilities which receive public money.
5/10/2007
S--1507
AB623
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes an appropriation to Nevada Child Seekers.
5/10/2007
R--1508
ACR33
Assembly Committee on Education
ACR: Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study on funding for public education and public school financing.
5/11/2007
32--1509
AB624
EMERGENCY REQUEST of Assembly Minority Leader
Makes changes concerning certain motor vehicles.
5/14/2007
Ch. 474
R--1510
SCR48
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Urges that automobile manufacturers make certain information and tools available to independent motor vehicle repair shops.
5/15/2007
File 111
S--1511
AB626
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Establishes for the next biennium the amount to be paid to the Public Employees' Benefits Program for group insurance for certain active and retired public officers and employees.
5/15/2007
Ch. 378
58--1512
AB621
Assemblywoman Buckley, Senators Raggio and Townsend and Assemblywomen Kirkpatrick and Smith
Revises provisions governing tax exemptions and abatements to encourage construction of energy efficient buildings.
5/16/2007
Ch. 539
R--1513
ACR30
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
ACR: Creates an interim study concerning issues relating to senior citizens and veterans.
5/17/2007
14--1514
AB625
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes certain changes concerning court programs.
5/18/2007
Ch. 377
24--1515
SB573
Legislative Counsel
Makes various changes regarding precinct meetings of major political parties.
5/18/2007
Ch. 523
R--1516
SCR47
Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Requires the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning chancery courts.
5/18/2007
S--1517
SB572
Senate Committee on Finance
Extends reversion date of transfer of room tax proceeds required by previous session for the restoration and preservation of the exterior of the Lear Theater.
5/22/2007
R--1518
ACR31
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
ACR: Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study of issues relating to elections.
5/22/2007
R--1519
ACR32
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
ACR: Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study of the duties and activities of statutory legislative committees.
5/22/2007
20--1520
SB574
EMERGENCY REQUEST of Assembly Minority Leader
Reallocates existing transient lodging tax revenue to fund transportation projects in Clark County.
On Behalf Of Governor Gibbons 5/24/2007
R--1521
AR16
Legislative Counsel
AR: Designates certain members of the Assembly as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission.
5/25/2007
File 106
R--1522
SR9
Legislative Counsel
SR: Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission.
5/25/2007
File 107
S--1523
AB627
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Joint Requester: Senate Committee on Finance
Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 education for the 2007-2009 biennium.
5/25/2007
Ch. 343
S--1524
SB577
Legislative Counsel
Makes technical corrections to certain legislative measures.
5/28/2007
Ch. 421
43--1525 Senators Lee and Nolan
Makes various changes in the funding of highway projects.
5/28/2007
S--1526 W Legislative Counsel
Makes technical corrections to certain legislative measures.
5/28/2007
S--1527
SB575
Senate Committee on Finance
Joint Requester: Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Establishes maximum allowed salaries for certain employees in the classified and unclassified service of the State.
6/01/2007
Ch. 349
R--1528
ACR34
Assembly Committee on Judiciary
ACR: Requests the return to the Assembly from the Governor's office of Assembly Bill No. 483 of this session.
6/01/2007
File 108
S--1529
AB628
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Joint Requester: Senate Committee on Finance
Makes various changes regarding state financial administration and makes appropriations for the support of the civil government of the State.
6/01/2007
Ch. 350
S--1530
SB576
Senate Committee on Finance
Joint Requester: Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Authorizes expenditures by agencies of the State Government for the 2007-2009 biennium.
6/01/2007
Ch. 346
S--1531
SB578
Senate Committee on Finance
Joint Requester: Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Authorizes and provides funding for certain projects of capital improvement.
6/01/2007
Ch. 347
S--1532
AB629
Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes various changes concerning financial administration.
6/03/2007
Ch. 348
S--1533
SB579
Senate Committee on Finance
Makes various changes relating to state financial administration.
6/03/2007
Ch. 345
R--1534
ACR35
Assembly Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Creates interim studies of various issues.
6/03/2007
File 109
R--1535
SCR49
Legislative Counsel
SCR: Provides for the compensation of the clergy for services rendered to the Senate and Assembly during the 74th Session of the Nevada Legislature.
6/04/2007
File 112
R--1536
ACR36
First Conference Committee
ACR: Urges the Division of Insurance, the Department of Public Safety and local law enforcement to work together to find solutions to combat auto theft.
6/04/2007
File 110
First Previous

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2016 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo