Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
Legend:
* = The particular bill was introduced in the 73rd Session
** = The particular bill was introduced in the 22nd Special Session
             

SJR1  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove requirements concerning affidavits that must be affixed to referendum petitions and initiative petitions. (BDR C-688)
  Introduced On: Feb 12, 2007
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections 
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 12, 2007 - File No. 40.
SJR2  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the selection of justices and judges. (BDR C-177)
  Introduced On: Feb 13, 2007
  By: Raggio  Hardy  Care  Coffin  Carlton  Amodei  Mathews  Nolan  Titus  Townsend 
  Most Recent History Action: May 31, 2007 - File No. 104.
SJR3  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise certain provisions relating to elections. (BDR C-260)
  Introduced On: Feb 20, 2007
  By: Rhoads  Amodei  McGinness 
  Most Recent History Action: May 31, 2007 - File No. 105.
SJR4  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the Legislature to provide for the organization and duties of the Board of Regents and the appointment of its members by the Governor. (BDR C-1087)
  Introduced On: Feb 26, 2007
  By: Raggio  Townsend  Nolan 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 92.
SJR5  Urges the United States Congress to repeal the REAL ID Act of 2005. (BDR R-1390)
  Introduced On: Mar 12, 2007
  By: Transportation and Homeland Security 
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 14, 2007 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
SJR6  Urges Congress to reauthorize the State Children's Health Insurance Program to assure federal funding for the Nevada Check Up program. (BDR R-1313)
  Introduced On: Mar 19, 2007
  By: Horsford  Hardy 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 93.
SJR7  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution by adding the provisions of the Tax and Spending Control for Nevada initiative. (BDR C-1324)
  Introduced On: Mar 19, 2007
  By: Beers 
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 14, 2007 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
SJR8  Urges the President of the United States to make additional offshore areas available for energy development. (BDR R-1355)
  Introduced On: Mar 20, 2007
  By: Natural Resources 
  Most Recent History Action: May 19, 2007 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
SJR9  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to allow the Legislature to establish an intermediate appellate court. (BDR C-661)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Judiciary 
  Most Recent History Action: May 11, 2007 - File No. 69.
SJR10  Expresses support for the designation of trails for off-highway vehicles by certain federal agencies. (BDR R-1350)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Natural Resources 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 94.
SJR11  Encourages certain activities relating to the use of biomass in the production of energy in Nevada. (BDR R-402)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Natural Resources 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 95.
SJR12  Expresses disapproval of recent civil actions filed against local ranchers and the Bureau of Land Management in the management of public rangelands and the issuance of grazing permits for those public rangelands. (BDR R-396)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Natural Resources 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 96.
SJR13  Urges Congress to provide additional appropriations for the prevention and suppression of wildfires and the rehabilitation of public rangelands in Nevada. (BDR R-468)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Natural Resources 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 97.
SJR14  Urges Congress to lower the age of eligibility for Medicare coverage. (BDR R-127)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Human Resources and Education 
  Most Recent History Action: May 26, 2007 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
SJR15  Urges the President and Congress to continue to support the participation of the Republic of China on Taiwan in the World Health Organization. (BDR R-1358)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 98.
SJR16  Urges the President and Congress to support a free trade agreement between the Republic of China on Taiwan and the United States. (BDR R-1340)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 99.
SJR17  Urges Congress to enact the Resident Physician Shortage Reduction Act of 2007. (BDR R-1383)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections 
  Most Recent History Action: May 28, 2007 - File No. 100.
SJR18  Urges Congress to support a proposed off-highway vehicle park in Clark County. (BDR R-1433)
  Introduced On: Mar 26, 2007
  By: Government Affairs 
  Most Recent History Action: May 31, 2007 - File No. 102.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo