Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB478
Introduced on: Mar 19, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Buckley , Anderson , Oceguera , Conklin , Leslie , Carpenter , Denis , Gerhardt , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Mabey , Manendo , McClain , Munford , Parks , Parnell , Pierce , Smith , Amodei , Coffin , Titus
Revises provisions governing loans and loan services. (BDR 52-394)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 09, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Not Heard .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 11, 2007     12:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 03, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 10, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2007     04:00 PM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 600
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 856

Bill History

Mar 19, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 20, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 600.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 856.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 856 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 265.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo