Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB437
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2007
By: Commerce and Labor
Revises provisions concerning economic and energy development. (BDR 58-232)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 29, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 13, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 23, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 02, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 08, 2007     07:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
  Senate Finance     May. 15, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     May. 22, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Mentioned Not Agendized .
  Senate Finance     May. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 30, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 04   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 607
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 974
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1146
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1147

Bill History

Mar 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 607.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 974.) To printer.

May 30, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 1146 and 1147.)
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 05, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 1146 and 1147 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.
  • Effective: (a) June 14, 2007 for the purposes of adopting regulations and taking such other actions as are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) For all other purposes besides those described in paragraph (a). Sections 1, 30, 32, 36 to 46 inclusive, 49, 51 to 61, inclusive, 107, 109, 110, 111 and 113 effective June 14, 2007. Sections 1.5 to 29, inclusive, 43.5, 47, 51.3, 51.7, 108, 112 and 112.5 effective July 1, 2007. Sections 62 to 106, inclusive, effective October 1, 2007. Sections 31, 32.3, 32.5, 32.7, 33, 34 and 35 effective January 1, 2009. Section 48 effective January 1, 2010. Section 50 effective January 1, 2011. Sections 62 to 106, inclusive, expire by limitation June 30, 2011.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo