Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB493
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2007
By: Transportation
Revises provisions relating to studded tires. (BDR 43-1394)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 299.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 22, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 03, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 08, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 12   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Mar 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 13, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 14, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 299.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo