Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB504
Introduced on: Mar 22, 2007
By: Ways and Means
Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Department of Health and Human Services for expansion of mental health services. (BDR S-1254)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 93.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 22, 2007     11:13 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 28, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Finance     May. 07, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 01   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 14   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.640

Bill History

Mar 22, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 23, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 25, 2007

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 26, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 30, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 640.) To printer.

May 01, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 02, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 09, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 10, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

May 15, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 16, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 93.
  • Effective May 21, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo