Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB517
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2007
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Makes various changes to election laws. (BDR 24-542)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 29, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 05, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 17, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 226
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 867

Bill History

Mar 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 226.) To printer.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 867.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 867 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.
  • Sections 1 to 57, inclusive, and 59 and 60 of this act effective June 2, 2007. Section 57 of this act expires by limitation upon enactment of the Interstate Compact for Juveniles into law by the 35th jurisdiction. Section 58 of this act effective upon enactment of the Interstate Compact for Juveniles into law by the 35th jurisdiction.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo