Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB521
Introduced on: Mar 23, 2007
By: Judiciary
Revises provisions relating to the crimes of theft, fraud and racketeering. (BDR 15-500)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 05, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 12, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 08, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 15, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 16, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 31, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do not recede .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint                    
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 364
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 784
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1021

Bill History

Mar 23, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 26, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 364.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 23, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 784.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Amendment No. 1001 withdrawn.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1021.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 784 and 1021 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 784 and 1021 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: No decision reached.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 04, 2007

  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo