Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB534
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Ratifies the correction of certain clerical errors and the resolution of certain statutory conflicts in legislative enactments from previous sessions. (BDR S-1073)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 47.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 26, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 17, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 18, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Apr 30, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 03, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 07, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 08, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 15, 2007

  • Chapter 47.
  • Effective May 14, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo