Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB453
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Finance
Revises the provisions relating to problem gambling. (BDR 40-1410)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Apr. 13, 2007     07:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Finance     Apr. 30, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 22, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 23, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    May. 07   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 658

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 27, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

May 02, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 03, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 658.) To printer.

May 04, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

May 07, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

May 08, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237.
  • Effective May 31, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo