Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB44
Introduced on: Jan 30, 2007
By: Judiciary
Enacts the Uniform Disclaimer of Property Interests Act. (BDR 10-754)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 14, 2007     08:30 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 16, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Feb. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 14   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Jan 30, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 31, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 19, 2007

  • Read second time.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Feb 21, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 15, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 16, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo