Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB569
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-322)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 478.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb. 06, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 26, 2007     11:22 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 03, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 05, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 01, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 227
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 708

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 227.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 708.) To printer.

May 17, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 708 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 478.
  • Sections 1 to 97, inclusive, 99, 100, 101, and 102 of this act effective October 1, 2007. Section 97 of this act expires by limitation upon enactment of the Interstate Compact for Juveniles into law by the 35th jurisdiction. Section 98 of this act effective upon enactment of the Interstate Compact for Juveniles into law by the 35th jurisdiction.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo