Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB45
Introduced on: Jan 30, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Washington
Revises provisions governing the disposition of administrative assessments imposed for certain offenses. (BDR 14-672)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 22, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 22, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 05, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 267

Bill History

Jan 30, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 31, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 267.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo