Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB586
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Taxation
Provides for the enforcement of taxes and restrictions on the sale and use of cigarettes and other tobacco products.(BDR 32-515)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 434.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 26, 2007     11:30 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Without recommendation, and rerefer .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 25, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Taxation     May. 28, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Jun. 01, 2007     11:58 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 23   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 03   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 878
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1126

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 878.) To printer.

May 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1126.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 1126 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 434.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo