Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB593
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
Makes various changes relating to the Legislature and the Legislative Counsel Bureau. (BDR 17-1081)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 532.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 26, 2007     12:20 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 03, 2007     03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 154
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 802

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 154.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 802.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 802 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Chapter 532.
  • Sections 2 to 11, inclusive, and 12 of this act effective June 14, 2007. Section 1 of this act effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo