Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB487
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Natural Resources
Revises provisions relating to water resources in certain counties. (BDR 48-183)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 531.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 09, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 18, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Natural Resources     May. 29, 2007     12:20 PM    Minutes      Do not concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint     4th Reprint         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 475
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 636
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 893
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA34

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 475.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 636.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 893.) To printer.

May 25, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 893 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 893 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 893 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Chapter 531.
  • Sections 56 and 57 effective July 1, 2007. Sections 1 to 23, inclusive, and 25 to 55, inclusive, effective April 1, 2008. Section 24 effective July 1, 2007 for the purposes of authorizing the entities set forth in that section to enter into the cooperative agreement specified in that section: and April 1, 2008, for all other purposes, if the cooperative agreement specified in that section is entered into before that date. Expires by limitation April 1, 2008, if the cooperative agreement specified in that section has not been entered into before that date. Section 56 expires by limitation July 1, 2013.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo