Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB493
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Legislative Operations and Elections
Makes various changes to voter registration and voting procedures for certain members of the Armed Forces of the United States and their family members and certain other voters who reside outside the United States. (BDR 24-811)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, but without recommendation .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo