Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB502
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Taxation
Revises various provisions governing sales and use taxes to ensure continued compliance with the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement and repeals certain obsolete provisions for the administration of those taxes. (BDR 32-556)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 443.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Taxation     May. 10, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Taxation     May. 17, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Taxation     May. 28, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 437
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 850

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 437.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) To printer.

May 22, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 850 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 443.
  • Sections 1 to 48, inclusive, and subsection 1 of section 49 and 50 effective October 1, 2007. Subsection 2 of section 49 effective January 1, 2009, only if the proposal submitted pursuant to sections 40 to 44, inclusive, of this act is approved by the voters at the general election on November 4, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo