Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB519
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Government Affairs
Makes various changes relating to abandoned property. (BDR 10-496)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 264

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 264.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 07, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo