Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB528
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Human Resources and Education
Provides for an incremental reduction in certain excise taxes payable by financial institutions and other employers that contribute to health savings accounts for their employees. (BDR 32-1179)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 03, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 10, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                                
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 406

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 05, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 406.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo