Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB529
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Human Resources and Education
Revises certain provisions relating to Medicaid. (BDR 38-601)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 454.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 04, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 02, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 18, 2007     12:00 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Do not concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 325
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 985

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 325.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 985.) To printer.

May 25, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 985 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 30, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 985 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 31, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 985.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 454.
  • Effective July 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo