Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB47
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom
Revises circumstances under which an attorney is excluded from regulation as a collection agency. (BDR 54-792)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 16, 2007 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 28, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 13, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Mar. 05   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Mar. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                             As Enrolled        

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 01, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 02, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 05, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Mar 06, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Mar 13, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 14, 2007

  • Read second time.

Mar 15, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Mar 16, 2007

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 20, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 23, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 3.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo