Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB536
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Human Resources and Education
Makes various changes governing the privacy of certain health information. (BDR 40-305)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 423.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 04, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr. 09, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 07, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 16, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May. 28, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 326
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 858
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA20

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 326.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 858.) To printer.

May 22, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.

May 26, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 858 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 31, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 858 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 03, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 858 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 04, 2007

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Chapter 423.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo