Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB542
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Judiciary
Revises provisions governing exemptions from execution by creditors. (BDR 2-1364)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 26, 2007     03:46 PM    Minutes       .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 02, 2007     09:30 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 02, 2007     09:07 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 17, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 31, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do not concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 13   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 838
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1026

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.

Apr 16, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.) To printer.

May 23, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1026.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 26, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To Senate.

May 29, 2007

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 838 and 1026 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 05, 2007

  • (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo