Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB49
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin , Gerhardt , Denis
Revises certain provisions concerning jury service. (BDR 1-145)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 136.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 14, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 06, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 11, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 15, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 18   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 22   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 430

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 430.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Apr 19, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2007

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 30, 2007

  • Chapter 136.
  • Effective May 29, 2007. The amendatory provisions of section 1 of this act expire by limitation on July 1, 2011.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo