Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB594
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Transportation
Creates a Class A certification designation for certain body shops. (BDR 43-451)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 26, 2007     11:20 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 29, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2007     02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 14, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 29, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 21   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1071
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. CA37

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 15, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2007

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 17, 2007

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.

May 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.

May 22, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 31, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1071.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 02, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1071 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1071 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2007

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 1071 and further amend. First Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 07, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 18, 2007

  • Chapter 546.
  • (Bill became law pursuant to Nevada Constitution Article 4, Section 35.)
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo