Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB595
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Transportation
Makes various changes relating to taxes on fuels and the provision of funding for highway projects. (BDR 32-643)
DECLARED EXEMPT
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 26, 2007     11:20 AM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 09, 2007     11:10 AM    Minutes      Without recommendation .
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 12, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer .
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 30, 2007     11:56 AM    Minutes      Without recommendation, and rerefer .
  Assembly Transportation     May. 31, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Taxation     Jun. 01, 2007     02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Jun. 01, 2007     02:00 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Taxation     Jun. 02, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Finance     Jun. 04, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      After Passage Discussion .
       
 
Votes (2/3 Majority Required)
  Assembly Final Passage    Jun. 01   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    Jun. 03   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 378
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1101
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 1124

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Transportation and Taxation. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committees.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From Concurrent Committee on Transportation: Without recommendation.
  • Action of concurrent referral to Committee on Taxation rescinded.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Apr 13, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Notice of exemption.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 378.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 16, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • To committee.

May 30, 2007

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Transportation.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

Jun 01, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1101.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 02, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2007

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1124.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1124 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 344.
  • Sections 1 to 46, inclusive, 49.5, 49.7, 55, 56 and 57 of this act effective June 6, 2007. Sections 46.5, 47.1 to 47.4, inclusive, 55.3 and 55.5 of this act effective July 1, 2007. Sections 47.5 and 49 of this act effective October 1, 2007. Sections 47 and 47.6 of this act effective July 1, 2008. Section 55.5 of this act expires by limitation December 31, 2015.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo