Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB600
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Government Affairs
Revises provisions concerning the protection of certain personal identifying information. (BDR 19-774)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 26, 2007     05:20 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 10, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 12, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 10, 2007     02:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 15, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     May. 17, 2007     11:40 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 18, 2007     01:00 PM    Minutes       .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 549
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 851

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 549.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 851.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 851 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 324.
  • Section 1 and sections 3 to 9, inclusive, of this act effective June 4, 2007. Section 2 of this act effective January 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo