Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB601
Introduced on: Mar 26, 2007
By: Government Affairs
Provides for collective bargaining for certain state employees. (BDR 23-1147)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 26, 2007     05:20 PM    Minutes      Discussed as BDR .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Apr. 16   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Mar 26, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 28, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2007

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2007

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.

Apr 17, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 19, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo