Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
AB51
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera
Revises provisions pertaining to the disclosure of certain information regarding applicants for certain positions with public safety agencies. (BDR 19-247)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 15, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb. 19, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Do pass .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 06, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 29, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Assembly Final Passage    Feb. 21   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Senate Final Passage    May. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint                         As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 936

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled.
  • Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 19, 2007

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 20, 2007

  • Read second time.

Feb 21, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Feb 22, 2007

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To committee.

May 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 936.) To printer.

May 24, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 25, 2007

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2007

  • Senate Amendment No. 936 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 285.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo