Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB61
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: Transportation and Homeland Security
Provides for a pilot program for local governments to use certain automated systems for the enforcement of traffic laws. (BDR 43-330)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Feb. 27, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 24   Yea 6,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                        
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 53
Adopted Amendment: Amend. No. 577

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 18, 2007

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 53.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 577.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 6, Nays: 15.)

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo