Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB62
Introduced on: Feb 01, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care
Revises provisions regarding the number of license plates displayed on vehicles. (BDR 43-432)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Feb. 08, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Transportation and Homeland Security     Mar. 13, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
 
Bill Text  As Introduced                                    

Bill History

Feb 01, 2007

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security. To printer.

Feb 02, 2007

  • From printer.

Feb 05, 2007

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 23, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2007

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 25, 2007

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo